LA SCR66 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to take action against illegal, unreported, and unregulated fishing in Louisiana's sovereign waters by passing H.R. 774, the Illegal, Unreported, and Unregulated Fishing Enforcement Act of 2015.
Title
Memorializes Congress to take action against illegal, unreported, and unregulated fishing in Louisiana's sovereign waters by passing H.R. 774, the Illegal, Unreported, and Unregulated Fishing Enforcement Act of 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 66 ADOPT (#356) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2015-05-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2015-05-20 | House | Read by title, concurred in. |
2015-05-19 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2015-05-19 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |