LA SCR64 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Recreates the Louisiana Public Defender Optimal Funding Group to study and make recommendations regarding the feasibility of establishing an optimal funding mechanism for the Louisiana Public Defender Board.
Title
Recreates the Louisiana Public Defender Optimal Funding Group to study and make recommendations regarding the feasibility of establishing an optimal funding mechanism for the Louisiana Public Defender Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 64 ADOPT (#949) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-06-07 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2023-06-07 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |