LA SCR64 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/12/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expresses sincere and heartfelt condolences on the passing of Rose Landry Long.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expresses sincere and heartfelt condolences on the passing of Rose Landry Long.

Sponsors

Sen. Yvonne Dorsey-Colomb [D]Sen. John Alario [R]Sen. R Allain [R]Sen. Conrad Appel [R]
Sen. Regina Barrow [D]Sen. Wesley Bishop [D]Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D]Sen. Troy Carter [D]
Sen. Norby Chabert [R]Sen. Dan Claitor [R]Sen. Patrick Cortez [R]Sen. Jack Donahue [R]
Sen. Dale Erdey [R]Sen. James Fannin [R]Sen. Ryan Gatti [R]Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R]
Sen. Ronnie Johns [R]Sen. Eric LaFleur [D]Sen. Eddie Lambert [R]Sen. Gerald Long [R]
Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]Sen. Daniel Martiny [R]Sen. John Milkovich [D]Sen. Fred Mills [R]
Sen. Beth Mizell [R]Sen. Jean-Paul Morrell [D]Sen. Dan Morrish [R]Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]
Sen. Jonathan Perry [R]Sen. Karen Peterson [D]Sen. Neil Riser [R]Sen. Gary Smith [D]
Sen. John Smith [R]Sen. Gregory Tarver [D]Sen. Francis Thompson [D]Sen. Michael Walsworth [R]
Sen. Rick Ward [D]Sen. Mack White [R]Rep. Mark Abraham [R]Rep. Neil Abramson [D]
Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]Rep. John Anders [D]Rep. James Armes [D]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]
Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]Rep. John Bagneris [D]Rep. Taylor Barras [R]Rep. John Berthelot [R]
Rep. Robert Billiot [D]Rep. Stuart Bishop [R]Rep. Joseph Bouie [D]Rep. Christopher Broadwater [R]
Rep. Chad Brown [D]Rep. Terry Brown [I]Rep. Thomas Carmody [R]Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]
Rep. Gary Carter [D]Rep. Robert Carter [D]Rep. Stephen Carter [R]Rep. Charles Chaney [R]
Rep. Patrick Connick [R]Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. George Cromer [R]
Rep. Michael Danahay [D]Rep. Paula Davis [R]Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]Rep. Stephen Dwight [R]
Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]Rep. Reid Falconer [R]Rep. Franklin Foil [R]
Rep. A.B. Franklin [D]Rep. Randal Gaines [D]Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D]
Rep. Cedric Glover [D]Rep. John Guinn [R]Rep. Jeff Hall [D]Rep. Jimmy Harris [D]
Rep. Lance Harris [R]Rep. Kenneth Havard [R]Rep. Lowell Hazel [R]Rep. Cameron Henry [R]
Rep. Bob Hensgens [R]Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. Dorothy Hill [D]Rep. Valarie Hodges [R]
Rep. Frank Hoffmann [R]Rep. Paul Hollis [R]Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. Frank Howard [R]
Rep. Marcus Hunter [D]Rep. Mike Huval [R]Rep. Barry Ivey [R]Rep. Katrina Jackson [D]
Rep. Edward James [D]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]Rep. Robert Johnson [D]
Rep. Sam Jones [D]Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]Rep. Nancy Landry [R]Rep. Terry Landry [D]
Rep. Bernard LeBas [D]Rep. Walt Leger [D]Rep. Christopher Leopold [R]Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]
Rep. Sherman Mack [R]Rep. Tanner Magee [R]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. Joseph Marino [R]
Rep. Jack McFarland [R]Rep. Blake Miguez [R]Rep. Dustin Miller [D]Rep. Gregory Miller [R]
Rep. Helena Moreno [D]Rep. John Morris [R]Rep. James Morris [R]Rep. Barbara Norton [D]
Rep. Kevin Pearson [R]Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Rogers Pope [R]Rep. Edward Price [D]
Rep. Stephen Pugh [R]Rep. Steve Pylant [R]Rep. Eugene Reynolds [D]Rep. Jerome Richard [I]
Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. John Schroder [R]Rep. Alan Seabaugh [R]Rep. Robert Shadoin [R]
Rep. Scott Simon [R]Rep. Patricia Smith [D]Rep. Joseph Stagni [D]Rep. John Stefanski [D]
Rep. Julie Stokes [R]Rep. Kirk Talbot [R]Rep. Major Thibaut [D]Rep. Polly Thomas [R]
Rep. Malinda White [D]Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]

Roll Calls

2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 64 ADOPT (#168) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/12/2017.
2017-05-03HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2017-05-03SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2017-05-02SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2017-05-02HouseRead by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
2017-05-02HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2017-05-02SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback