LA SCR63 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Louisiana Offshore Oil Port on its 40th anniversary of deepwater port operation.
Title
Commends the Louisiana Offshore Oil Port on its 40th anniversary of deepwater port operation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 63 ADOPT (#417) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021. |
2021-05-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2021-05-24 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2021-05-20 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2021-05-20 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |