LA SCR58 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-11)
Status: Passed on May 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Signed by the Speaker of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expresses condolences upon the death of Melinda Waller Mangham.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expresses condolences upon the death of Melinda Waller Mangham.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 58 CO-AUTHORS (#75) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 58 ADOPT (#74) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-15SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-14SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2020-05-13HouseRead by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
2020-05-13HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2020-05-11SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2020-05-07SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback