LA SCR58 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-10)
Status: Passed on May 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-10)
Status: Passed on May 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences upon the death of Melinda Waller Mangham.
Title
Expresses condolences upon the death of Melinda Waller Mangham.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 58 CO-AUTHORS (#75) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 58 ADOPT (#74) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 58 ADOPT (#74) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2020-05-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |