LA SCR58 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests that the mayor and the City Council of the city of New Orleans study the rate of evictions in New Orleans including causes.
Title
Requests that the mayor and the City Council of the city of New Orleans study the rate of evictions in New Orleans including causes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SCR 58 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#693) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 58 ADOPT (#322) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 58 ADOPT (#322) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/30/2019. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-05-30 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 100 yeas, 1 nays. |
2019-05-30 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-05-30 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19. |
2019-05-20 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2019-05-15 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2019-05-14 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |