LA SCR43 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the Louisiana Historical Archives Task Force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Louisiana Historical Archives Task Force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 43 CONCUR (#1034) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - House - House Vote on SCR 43 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#982) (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 43 ADOPT (#367) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-15SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-14SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
2018-05-11SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-05-11HouseRead by title, concurred in by vote of 82 yeas, 0 nays.
2018-05-11HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-05-11HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/11/18.
2018-04-26HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-25HouseReported with amendments (8-0).
2018-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-04-11HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2018-04-11SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2018-04-10SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-09SenateReported with amendments.
2018-03-27SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-03-26SenateRules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SCR43&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078986
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083572
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096487
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083543
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090096
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089502
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095973
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078987
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085006
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1100381
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085514
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095756
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096392

Bill Comments

feedback