LA SCR40 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests Governor Jeffrey M. Landry to make application to receive funding for the Summer EBT program. (EN +$3,652,670 GF EX See Note)
Title
Urges and requests Governor Jeffrey M. Landry to make application to receive funding for the Summer EBT program. (EN +$3,652,670 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - House - House Vote on SCR 40 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1409) (Y: 90 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 40 CO-AUTHORS (#441) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 40 ADOPT (#440) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 40 CO-AUTHORS (#441) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 40 ADOPT (#440) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2024-05-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2024-05-28 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 90 yeas, 10 nays. |
2024-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2024. |
2024-05-14 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-13 | House | Reported favorably (19-0). |
2024-05-01 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2024-04-30 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-30 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |