LA SCR36 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/5/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/5/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Herb Schilling on being honored at the UL-Lafayette Alumni Association's 25th annual Spring Gala.
Title
Commends Herb Schilling on being honored at the UL-Lafayette Alumni Association's 25th annual Spring Gala.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 36 ADOPT (#372) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/5/2022. |
2022-04-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-04-26 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2022-04-25 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-25 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |