LA SCR25 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the division of administration to review the eligibility of Louisiana district attorneys to obtain reimbursement under the "public safety" presumption of the CARES Act. (EN SEE FISC NOTE FF EX See Note)
Title
Requests the division of administration to review the eligibility of Louisiana district attorneys to obtain reimbursement under the "public safety" presumption of the CARES Act. (EN SEE FISC NOTE FF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Reese [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - House - House Vote on SCR 25 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#173) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 25 ADOPT (#115) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 25 ADOPT (#115) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020. |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-06-30 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 93 yeas, 0 nays. |
2020-06-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/30/20. |
2020-06-29 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-06-29 | House | Reported favorably (23-0). |
2020-06-29 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2020-06-28 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |