LA SCR2 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the ratification of the Equal Rights Amendment.
Title
Provides for the ratification of the Equal Rights Amendment.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean-Paul Morrell [D] | Sen. Wesley Bishop [D] | Sen. Troy Carter [D] | Sen. Karen Peterson [D] |
Sen. Joseph Bouie [D] | Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 2 ADOPT (#291) (Y: 9 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 9 yeas and 26 nays. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |