LA SCR146 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Senate Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection, and International Affairs and the House Committee on Commerce to study the regulation of debt settlement services.
Title
Requests the Senate Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection, and International Affairs and the House Committee on Commerce to study the regulation of debt settlement services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12. | |
2012-06-01 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-01 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-31 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-05-31 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2012-05-31 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2012-05-31 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |
2012-05-30 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |