LA SCR144 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Fort Polk Heritage Families and the Heritage Family Association on their 10th year anniversary celebration of the Heritage Family Day Reunion.
Title
Commends Fort Polk Heritage Families and the Heritage Family Association on their 10th year anniversary celebration of the Heritage Family Day Reunion.
Sponsors
Sen. John Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 144 ADOPT (#1312) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2016. |
2016-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2016-06-05 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2016-06-05 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |