LA SCR138 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the St. Thomas More High School Soccer Team and Head Coach Casey Friend on winning the Division II State Championship for the 2015-2016 season.
Title
Commends the St. Thomas More High School Soccer Team and Head Coach Casey Friend on winning the Division II State Championship for the 2015-2016 season.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 138 ADOPT (#1148) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2016. |
2016-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2016-05-31 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2016-05-31 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |