LA SCR131 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to provide adequate funding to the United States Army Corps of Engineers for the completion of deepening the Mississippi River Ship Channel to fifty feet.
Title
Memorializes Congress to provide adequate funding to the United States Army Corps of Engineers for the completion of deepening the Mississippi River Ship Channel to fifty feet.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 131 ADOPT (#644) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019. |
2019-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-06-02 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2019-06-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |