LA SCR125 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Passed on June 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Passed on June 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to urge the U.S. Department of State to approve the presidential permit application allowing the construction and operation of the TransCanada Keystone XL pipeline between the United States and Canada.
Title
Memorializes Congress to urge the U.S. Department of State to approve the presidential permit application allowing the construction and operation of the TransCanada Keystone XL pipeline between the United States and Canada.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 125 CO-AUTHORS (#861) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 125 ADOPT (#860) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 125 ADOPT (#860) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013. |
2013-06-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2013-06-02 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2013-06-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |