LA SCR114 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Re-establishes the Lower Pearl River Basin task force.
Title
Re-establishes the Lower Pearl River Basin task force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 114 CONCUR (#975) (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on SCR 114 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#925) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 114 ADOPT (#615) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on SCR 114 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#925) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 114 ADOPT (#615) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019. |
2019-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 27 yeas and 0 nays. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2019-06-03 | House | Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 97 yeas, 0 nays. |
2019-06-03 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2019-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/19. |
2019-05-31 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-31 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-05-31 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-30 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |