LA SCR111 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Health and Hospitals to submit a report to the legislature that addresses the issue of raising Louisiana's health ranking as determined by the United Health Foundation's "America's Health Rankings".
Title
Directs the Department of Health and Hospitals to submit a report to the legislature that addresses the issue of raising Louisiana's health ranking as determined by the United Health Foundation's "America's Health Rankings".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-01 - House - House Vote on SCR 111, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1440) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 111, ADOPT (#1130) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 111, ADOPT (#1130) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12. | |
2012-06-03 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-03 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-06-01 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-06-01 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 97 yeas, 0 nays. | |
2012-05-31 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012. | |
2012-05-31 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2012-05-30 | Reported favorably (15-0). | |
2012-05-21 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2012-05-17 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2012-05-17 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |
2012-05-16 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-05-15 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2012-05-15 | Rules suspended | |
2012-05-15 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |