LA SCR103 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a study of credits, exemption, and rebates and the corresponding impact on the state budget.
Title
Provides for a study of credits, exemption, and rebates and the corresponding impact on the state budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 103, CONCUR (#1713) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 103, ADOPT (#900) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 103, ADOPT (#900) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12. | |
2012-06-04 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-04 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-06-03 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2012-06-03 | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. | |
2012-06-03 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2012-06-01 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2012-06-01 | Read by title, amended, concurred in. | |
2012-05-31 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012. | |
2012-05-31 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2012-05-30 | Reported with amendments (9-0). | |
2012-05-22 | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-05-21 | Reported favorably (18-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-05-14 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2012-05-11 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2012-05-10 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |
2012-05-09 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |