LA SCR1 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/10/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/10/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences upon the death of Malcolm John "Dr. John" Rebennack Jr.
Title
Expresses condolences upon the death of Malcolm John "Dr. John" Rebennack Jr.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 1 ADOPT (#4) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/10/2020. |
2020-06-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-06-08 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |
2020-06-05 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 26 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |