LA SB9 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Effective date 1/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Effective date 1/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to safety belts. (Item #40) (1/1/21) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Title
Provides relative to safety belts. (Item #40) (1/1/21) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote on SB 9 FINAL PASSAGE (#106) (Y: 76 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 9 FINAL PASSAGE (#27) (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 9 FINAL PASSAGE (#27) (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2021. |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 36. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-06-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-06-24 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 25. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-06-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/24/20. |
2020-06-23 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-06-22 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-06-18 | House | Reported favorably (10-4-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-06-15 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2020-06-11 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 24 yeas and 10 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |