LA SB88 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-14)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-14)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Louisiana Highway 352 in St. Martin Parish as the "Pat Huval Memorial Highway" and the Old Abbeville Bridge crossing, the Vermilion River on Louisiana Highway 14 East (Port Street) in Abbeville as the "Vermilion Parish Veterans Memorial Bridge". (8/1/18)
Title
Designates Louisiana Highway 352 in St. Martin Parish as the "Pat Huval Memorial Highway" and the Old Abbeville Bridge crossing, the Vermilion River on Louisiana Highway 14 East (Port Street) in Abbeville as the "Vermilion Parish Veterans Memorial Bridge". (8/1/18)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 88 CONCUR (#817) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Vote on SB 88 FINAL PASSAGE (#733) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 88 FINAL PASSAGE (#111) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Vote on SB 88 FINAL PASSAGE (#733) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 88 FINAL PASSAGE (#111) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2018. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 230. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-05-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/18. |
2018-04-18 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-17 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-03-22 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-03-21 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-02-25 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |