LA SB803 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create a Coroner's Strategic Initiative for a Health Information and Intervention Program in the office of the coroner in each parish. (8/15/10)
Title
Create a Coroner's Strategic Initiative for a Health Information and Intervention Program in the office of the coroner in each parish. (8/15/10)
Sponsors
Sen. Sherri Cheek [R] | Sen. Jack Donahue [R] | Sen. D.A. Gautreaux [D] | Sen. Willie Mount [D] |
Sen. Ben Nevers [D] | Sen. Karen Peterson [D] | Rep. Scott Simon [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 803, CONCUR (#1967) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 803, FINAL PASSAGE (#1818) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 803, FINAL PASSAGE (#804) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 803, FINAL PASSAGE (#1818) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 803, FINAL PASSAGE (#804) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-02 | Effective date 8/15/10. | |
2010-07-02 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 907. | |
2010-06-21 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/23. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-21 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-20 | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2010-06-18 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2010-06-18 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/18/2010. | |
2010-06-17 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-06-16 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-06-15 | Reported with amendments (13-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-11 | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-06-10 | Reported with amendments (8-0-1) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-05-27 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2010-05-26 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-05-25 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-24 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-20 | Substitute for Senate Bill No. 773. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |