LA SB78 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/19.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to behavioral health services provided to students. (8/1/19)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to behavioral health services provided to students. (8/1/19)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 78 FINAL PASSAGE (#204) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/28/19.
2019-05-20HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-16HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-15HouseReported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-06HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-05-02HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-05-01SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-30SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-29SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
2019-03-26SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback