LA SB76 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective date 8/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective date 8/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the hotel and lodging exception permit. (8/1/21) (EN SEE FISC NOTE See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the hotel and lodging exception permit. (8/1/21) (EN SEE FISC NOTE See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Talbot [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 76 FINAL PASSAGE (#1060) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 76 FINAL PASSAGE (#191) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 76 FINAL PASSAGE (#191) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2021. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 290. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2021-06-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2021-06-07 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-06-07 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-06-07 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2021. |
2021-06-02 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-06-01 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2021-05-27 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2021-05-03 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |