LA SB750 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Effective date 1/1/13.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Effective date 1/1/13.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the consideration of certain poverty impact issues and issuance of a poverty impact statement prior to the adoption, amendment, or repeal of rules by a state agency. (1/1/13) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Requires the consideration of certain poverty impact issues and issuance of a poverty impact statement prior to the adoption, amendment, or repeal of rules by a state agency. (1/1/13) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 750, CONCUR (#1556) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 750, FINAL PASSAGE (#1262) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 750, FINAL PASSAGE (#492) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 750, FINAL PASSAGE (#1262) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 750, FINAL PASSAGE (#492) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-14 | Effective date 1/1/13. | |
2012-06-14 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 854. | |
2012-06-01 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-05-31 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-31 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-30 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 1 nays. | |
2012-05-29 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2012-05-29 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 6. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-24 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2012. | |
2012-05-24 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2012. | |
2012-05-17 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-16 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-15 | Reported favorably (7-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-04-26 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-04-25 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-04-24 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 2 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-23 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-19 | Substitute for Senate Bill No. 328. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |