LA SB725 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for inclusion of certain areas of incorporated municipalities into a parish-wide economic and industrial development district wherein certain unincorporated areas are excluded. (8/1/12)
Title
Provides for inclusion of certain areas of incorporated municipalities into a parish-wide economic and industrial development district wherein certain unincorporated areas are excluded. (8/1/12)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 725, FINAL PASSAGE (#1231) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 725, FINAL PASSAGE (#550) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 725, FINAL PASSAGE (#550) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | Effective date 8/1/12. | |
2012-06-07 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 688. | |
2012-06-01 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-30 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-29 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-05-29 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-24 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2012. | |
2012-05-22 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent. | |
2012-05-21 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-21 | Reported favorably (11-0-1) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-01 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2012-04-30 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-04-26 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-24 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-23 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-04-03 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |