LA SB723 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-19)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Effective date 6/7/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-19)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Effective date 6/7/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Louisiana International Commerce Initiative. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the Louisiana International Commerce Initiative. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 723, CONCUR (#1461) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 723, FINAL PASSAGE (#1075) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 723, AMENDMENT # 414 BY HODGES, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1074) (Y: 23 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 723, CO-AUTHORS (#615) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 723, FINAL PASSAGE (#614) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 723, AMENDMENT # 3516 BY GALLOT, ADOPT (#613) (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 723, AMENDMENT # 3413 BY CROWE, SB 723 BY APPEL (#612) (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 723, AMENDMENT # 3407 BY GALLOT, SB 723 BY APPEL (#611) (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 723, FINAL PASSAGE (#1075) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 723, AMENDMENT # 414 BY HODGES, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1074) (Y: 23 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 723, CO-AUTHORS (#615) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 723, FINAL PASSAGE (#614) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 723, AMENDMENT # 3516 BY GALLOT, ADOPT (#613) (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 723, AMENDMENT # 3413 BY CROWE, SB 723 BY APPEL (#612) (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 723, AMENDMENT # 3407 BY GALLOT, SB 723 BY APPEL (#611) (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | Effective date 6/7/12. | |
2012-06-07 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 687. | |
2012-06-01 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-29 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-28 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays. | |
2012-05-24 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2012-05-22 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-16 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/22/2012. | |
2012-05-09 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-08 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-07 | Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-03 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2012-05-02 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-05-01 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-01 | Called from the Calendar. | |
2012-04-30 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2012-04-26 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-25 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-04-03 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |