LA SB682 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-19 - Effective date 6/19/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-19 - Effective date 6/19/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the Louisiana First America Next Freedom and Empowerment Plan. (gov sig) (RE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for the Louisiana First America Next Freedom and Empowerment Plan. (gov sig) (RE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 682 FINAL PASSAGE (#1506) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 682 FINAL PASSAGE (#1234) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 682 FINAL PASSAGE (#1234) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | Effective date 6/19/2014. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 783. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2014-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-06-01 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2014-05-30 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 2. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-05-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2014. |
2014-05-29 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-05-29 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2014-05-29 | House | Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-05-29 | House | Rules suspended. |
2014-05-29 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2014-05-28 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2014-05-22 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2014-05-21 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Substitute for Senate Bill No. 107. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. |