LA SB64 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Received from the House with amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes group health insurance providers to consent on behalf of their employees for use of electronic documents. (8/1/19)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes group health insurance providers to consent on behalf of their employees for use of electronic documents. (8/1/19)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 64 FINAL PASSAGE (#547) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 64 FINAL PASSAGE (#102) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2019-05-22HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
2019-05-09HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-08HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-07HouseReported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-04-24HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2019-04-23HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-23SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-17SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-16SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2019-03-26SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback