LA SB584 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Louisiana Statewide Education Facilities Authority. (8/15/10) (EN SEE FISC NOTE EX See Note)
Title
Creates the Louisiana Statewide Education Facilities Authority. (8/15/10) (EN SEE FISC NOTE EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 584, CONCUR (#1949) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 584, FINAL PASSAGE (#1809) (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 584, FINAL PASSAGE (#512) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 584, FINAL PASSAGE (#1809) (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 584, FINAL PASSAGE (#512) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-02 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2010-06-21 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-21 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-20 | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2010-06-18 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2010-06-18 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 75, nays 23. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/18/2010. | |
2010-06-17 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-06-16 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-06-15 | Reported with amendments (12-1) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-05-11 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-05-10 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-04 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-03 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Education. | |
2010-03-19 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Education. |