LA SB58 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-27-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Effective date 6/18/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-27-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Effective date 6/18/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allows certain meats and fish to be received or used by a not-for-profit entity or charitable organization. (gov sig)
Title
Allows certain meats and fish to be received or used by a not-for-profit entity or charitable organization. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 58 FINAL PASSAGE (#667) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 58 FINAL PASSAGE (#282) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 58 CO-AUTHORS (#281) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 58 FINAL PASSAGE (#282) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 58 CO-AUTHORS (#281) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | Senate | Effective date 6/18/2013. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 371. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2013-05-29 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2013. |
2013-05-23 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-22 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-21 | House | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2013-05-08 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |