LA SB56 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-05 - Effective date 11/5/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-05 - Effective date 11/5/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to health maintenance organizations.
Title
Provides relative to health maintenance organizations.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Talbot [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-15 - House - House Vote on SB 56 FINAL PASSAGE (#159) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-10-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 56 FINAL PASSAGE (#67) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-10-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 56 FINAL PASSAGE (#67) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-05 | Senate | Effective date 11/5/2020. |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 58. |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-10-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-10-15 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-10-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/15/20. |
2020-10-14 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-10-14 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-14 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-10-14 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-10-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2020-10-12 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |