LA SB50 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 40, nays 59. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits use of a handheld wireless telecommunications device by a person when operating a motor vehicle upon any public roadway in this state. (8/1/20) (REF INCREASE LF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits use of a handheld wireless telecommunications device by a person when operating a motor vehicle upon any public roadway in this state. (8/1/20) (REF INCREASE LF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 50 FINAL PASSAGE (#440) (Y: 40 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 50 FINAL PASSAGE (#159) (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 40, nays 59. Failed to pass.
2020-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-20HouseReported with amendments (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-15HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2020-05-13SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 5 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-07SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2020-02-19SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB50&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1156118
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170410
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171999
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170087
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171795
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173504
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173795
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174785
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174902
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174365
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176404
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175238
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176683
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1156119
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170686
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171483
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171666
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172197
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172637
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173918
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173962
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171918
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176414

Bill Comments

feedback