LA SB488 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date 8/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date 8/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes millage rate increases in certain parishes. (8/1/22) (EN NO IMPACT LF EX See Note)
Title
Authorizes millage rate increases in certain parishes. (8/1/22) (EN NO IMPACT LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - House - House Vote on SB 488 FINAL PASSAGE (#1157) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 488 FINAL PASSAGE (#436) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 488 FINAL PASSAGE (#436) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2022. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 269. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2022. |
2022-05-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-05-25 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2022. |
2022-05-11 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-10 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-09 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2022-05-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |