LA SB486 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Scotlandville Magnet High School" special prestige license plate. (8/1/18)
Title
Creates the "Scotlandville Magnet High School" special prestige license plate. (8/1/18)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 486 CONCUR (#1082) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Vote on SB 486 FINAL PASSAGE (#815) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 486 FINAL PASSAGE (#375) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Vote on SB 486 FINAL PASSAGE (#815) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 486 FINAL PASSAGE (#375) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-20 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2018. |
2018-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 389. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-05-08 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/18. |
2018-04-25 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-24 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-23 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-04-12 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |