LA SB48 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Effective date 8/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Effective date 8/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes an increase in court costs in the mayor's court of the town of Rosepine. (2/3 - CA7s2.1) (8/1/14) (EN +$37,500 LF RV See Note)
Title
Authorizes an increase in court costs in the mayor's court of the town of Rosepine. (2/3 - CA7s2.1) (8/1/14) (EN +$37,500 LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. John Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-19 - House - House Vote on SB 48 FINAL PASSAGE (#1020) (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 48 FINAL PASSAGE (#134) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 48 FINAL PASSAGE (#134) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2014. |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 365. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2014-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2014-05-19 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2014. |
2014-05-06 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-05-05 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2014-04-30 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-03-27 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2014-03-26 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |