LA SB479 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-13 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 509.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-13 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 509.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the office of violence prevention in the Louisiana Department of Health. (8/1/24) (OR +$1,184,867 GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the office of violence prevention in the Louisiana Department of Health. (8/1/24) (OR +$1,184,867 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Senate | Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 509. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Reported by substitute. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |