LA SB475 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-13 - Effective date 7/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-13 - Effective date 7/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for performance based tax rebates by local governmental subdivisions for musical or other entertainment events held in public facilities under certain conditions. (7/1/12)
Title
Provides for performance based tax rebates by local governmental subdivisions for musical or other entertainment events held in public facilities under certain conditions. (7/1/12)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 475, CONCUR (#1640) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 475, REJECT (#1639) (Y: 15 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 475, FINAL PASSAGE (#1399) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 475, FINAL PASSAGE (#737) (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 475, REJECT (#1639) (Y: 15 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 475, FINAL PASSAGE (#1399) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 475, FINAL PASSAGE (#737) (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | Effective date 7/1/12. | |
2012-06-13 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 787. | |
2012-06-04 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-06-03 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-03 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-06-01 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 1 nays. | |
2012-05-31 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2012-05-31 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-31 | Called from the calendar. | |
2012-05-31 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-05-24 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/31/2012. | |
2012-05-23 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-22 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-21 | Reported with amendments (16-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-08 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2012-05-07 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-05-03 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-02 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-01 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | |
2012-03-02 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |