LA SB473 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to nonresident combination lifetime hunting and fishing licenses for certain veterans who have been wounded or disabled during active duty. (8/15/10) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to nonresident combination lifetime hunting and fishing licenses for certain veterans who have been wounded or disabled during active duty. (8/15/10) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Long [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 473, CONCUR (#1140) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 473, FINAL PASSAGE (#1252) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 473, FINAL PASSAGE (#496) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 473, FINAL PASSAGE (#1252) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 473, FINAL PASSAGE (#496) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Effective date 8/15/10. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 336. | |
2010-06-11 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-06-10 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-10 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-09 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2010-06-08 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2010-06-08 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-04 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/8/2010. | |
2010-05-20 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-19 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-05-18 | Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-06 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |
2010-05-05 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-05-05 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-04 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-03 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Natural Resources. | |
2010-03-19 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Natural Resources. |