LA SB448 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals requirement that BESE, the Board of Regents, and the postsecondary education management boards develop an academic assistance program in public high schools for college bound students unprepared for college work. (8/15/10)
Title
Repeals requirement that BESE, the Board of Regents, and the postsecondary education management boards develop an academic assistance program in public high schools for college bound students unprepared for college work. (8/15/10)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on SB 448, FINAL PASSAGE (#1503) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 448, FINAL PASSAGE (#482) (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 448, FINAL PASSAGE (#482) (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Effective date 8/15/10. | |
2010-06-29 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 652. | |
2010-06-17 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-06-16 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-16 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-15 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-06-15 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/15/2010. | |
2010-06-07 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent. | |
2010-06-04 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-06-03 | Reported favorably (15-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-05 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-05-04 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-05-04 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-04 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-04-14 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2010-04-13 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-04-12 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Education. | |
2010-03-18 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Education. |