LA SB441 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a public officer who has retired or resigned from office from qualifying for the same office at a special election to fill the position. (8/1/22)
Title
Prohibits a public officer who has retired or resigned from office from qualifying for the same office at a special election to fill the position. (8/1/22)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 441 ADOPT (#1443) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on SB 441 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1703) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 441 REJECT (#1364) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 441 FINAL PASSAGE (#1419) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 441 FINAL PASSAGE (#305) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on SB 441 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1703) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 441 REJECT (#1364) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 441 FINAL PASSAGE (#1419) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 441 FINAL PASSAGE (#305) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-18 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2022. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2022-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2022-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. |
2022-06-06 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2022-06-06 | House | House conferees appointed: Orgeron, Stefanski, and Illg. |
2022-06-05 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Hewitt, Fesi, and Milligan. |
2022-06-05 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2022-06-02 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2022. |
2022-05-23 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-19 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-18 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-04-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-04-19 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |