LA SB420 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Effective date 6/8/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Effective date 6/8/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires BESE and the Dept. of Agriculture and Forestry to develop and implement a Farm to School Program. (gov sig)
Title
Requires BESE and the Dept. of Agriculture and Forestry to develop and implement a Farm to School Program. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - House - House Vote on SB 420 FINAL PASSAGE (#1065) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 420 FINAL PASSAGE (#375) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 420 FINAL PASSAGE (#375) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Senate | Effective date 6/8/2016. |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 404. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2016-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2016-05-26 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2016. |
2016-05-19 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-18 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2016-05-17 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-04-25 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2016-04-21 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |