LA SB416 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 8/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 8/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Terminates the Calcasieu-Cameron Navigation District. (8/1/22)
Title
Terminates the Calcasieu-Cameron Navigation District. (8/1/22)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 416 FINAL PASSAGE (#1451) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 416 FINAL PASSAGE (#411) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 416 SB 416 BY ABRAHAM (#411) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 416 FINAL PASSAGE (#411) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 416 SB 416 BY ABRAHAM (#411) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-18 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2022. |
2022-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 755. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2022. |
2022-05-25 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-24 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-23 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-05-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |