LA SB416 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
Pending: House Municipal Committee
Hearing: May 28 @ 11:00 am in Room 3
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the New Orleans Public Belt Railroad. (See Act)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the New Orleans Public Belt Railroad. (See Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 416 FINAL PASSAGE (#273) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2020-05-20SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-19SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-18SenateReported with amendments.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2020-02-28SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB416&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164352
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173530
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174755
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173466
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174309
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174588
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174459
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164353
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174279
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174838
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174693

Bill Comments

feedback