LA SB395 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a railroad district encompassing Vermilion and Iberia parishes. (8/15/10)
Title
Creates a railroad district encompassing Vermilion and Iberia parishes. (8/15/10)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on SB 395, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1996) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 395, ADOPT (#2056) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 395, REJECT (#1941) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 395, FINAL PASSAGE (#1721) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 395, FINAL PASSAGE (#570) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 395, ADOPT (#2056) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 395, REJECT (#1941) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 395, FINAL PASSAGE (#1721) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 395, FINAL PASSAGE (#570) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Effective date 8/15/10. | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 780. | |
2010-06-21 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/23. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-21 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/22. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. | |
2010-06-21 | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. | |
2010-06-21 | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2010-06-21 | House conferees appointed: Champagne, Barrow, and Perry. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2010-06-21 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Gautreaux, N., McPherson, and Hebert. | |
2010-06-20 | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. | |
2010-06-20 | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending. | |
2010-06-18 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2010-06-17 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-06-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/17/2010. | |
2010-06-14 | Notice given. | |
2010-06-14 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-06-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2010. | |
2010-06-03 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-06-02 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-05-27 | Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-17 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2010-05-13 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-05-12 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-11 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-10 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |
2010-03-18 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |