LA SB371 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Effective date 6/7/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Effective date 6/7/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides authority for the Department of Health and Hospitals to create an upper payment limit mechanism for outpatient behavioral health services for Medicaid recipients under the age of twenty-one. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE FF EX See Note)
Title
Provides authority for the Department of Health and Hospitals to create an upper payment limit mechanism for outpatient behavioral health services for Medicaid recipients under the age of twenty-one. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE FF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 371, FINAL PASSAGE (#1412) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 371, FINAL PASSAGE (#1169) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 371, FINAL PASSAGE (#1169) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | Effective date 6/7/12. | |
2012-06-07 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 650. | |
2012-06-01 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-06-01 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-01 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-31 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-05-31 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-24 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/31/2012. | |
2012-05-24 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-23 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-22 | Reported favorably (12-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-21 | Rules suspended. Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2012-05-21 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-05-21 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-17 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-16 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2012-03-01 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |