LA SB371 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-17 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-17 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the requirement of filing articles of incorporation of certain reorganizing insurers with the secretary of state. (8/15/10)
Title
Eliminates the requirement of filing articles of incorporation of certain reorganizing insurers with the secretary of state. (8/15/10)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 371, FINAL PASSAGE (#664) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-17 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-06-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/17/2010. | |
2010-06-10 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-06-09 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-06-08 | Reported with amendments (9-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-20 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |
2010-05-19 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-05-18 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-13 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-12 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Insurance. | |
2010-03-18 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Insurance. |