LA SB367 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective date 6/17/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Effective date 6/17/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to the Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 367 CONCUR (#976) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Vote on SB 367 FINAL PASSAGE (#1151) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 367 FINAL PASSAGE (#324) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Vote on SB 367 FINAL PASSAGE (#1151) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 367 FINAL PASSAGE (#324) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | Senate | Effective date 6/17/2022. |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 547. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2022-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2022-05-25 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2022. |
2022-05-11 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-10 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-09 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-04-21 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2022-04-20 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |